This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 11:06:35 (UTC).

MITCHELL, MICHAEL NMN

Case Summary

On 08/09/1996 MITCHELL, MICHAEL NMN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MITCHELL, MICHAEL NMN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2009
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWR; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/1999
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: POSSIBLE MODIFI. OF SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/1999
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: POSSIBLE MODIFI. OF SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/1999
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: POSSIBLE MODIFI. OF SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/1999
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: REMITTITUR FILED-OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 664-187(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 215(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(B); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(B); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(B); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less