This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 03:54:31 (UTC).

MALONE, AARON DETRAYVON

Case Summary

On 01/27/1994 MALONE, AARON DETRAYVON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/1994

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MALONE, AARON DETRAYVON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: FORMAL HEARING ON PROB VIOLAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/1997
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/1997
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: STAY OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/1994
  • DispositionCharge Section: 242; Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/1994
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 180 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/1994
  • DispositionCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PRE-HEARING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PRE-HEARING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PRE-HEARING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PRE-HEARING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/1994
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/1994
  • DocketCharge Section: 242; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/1994
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less