This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 15:58:46 (UTC).

LORN, SAM BATH

Case Summary

On 04/04/1990 LORN, SAM BATH was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/1990

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

LORN, SAM BATH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 045; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING TRAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/1990
  • DispositionCharge Section: 664-187(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/1990
  • DispositionCharge Section: 664-187(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/1990
  • DispositionCharge Section: 187(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/1990
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/1990
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: 30N; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/1990
  • DocketCharge Section: 664-187(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/1990
  • DocketCharge Section: 664-187(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/1990
  • DocketCharge Section: 187(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less