This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 09:12:06 (UTC).

LOPEZ, MIGUEL AVITIA

Case Summary

On 01/09/1995 LOPEZ, MIGUEL AVITIA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/1995

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

LOPEZ, MIGUEL AVITIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/1998
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 148.9(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 14601.2(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11350(A); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 03; JAIL TERM: 180 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1998
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; JAIL TERM: 16 MONTH(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/1995
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 148.9(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 14601.2(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 11350(A); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less