This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 16:51:24 (UTC).

LEWIS, RONNY

Case Summary

On 10/08/1998 LEWIS, RONNY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********6-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/1998

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEWIS, RONNY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2001
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2001
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2001
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2000
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROGRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROGRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROGRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROGRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROOF OF ENROLLMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROOF OF ENROLLMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/1999
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1998
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 180 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11350(A); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/1998
  • DocketCharge Section: 11350(A); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less