This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 21:01:40 (UTC).

JENETT, DAVID ALAN

Case Summary

On 01/23/1998 JENETT, DAVID ALAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********8-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/1998

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

JENETT, DAVID ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2001
  • DocketLocation: Pasadena Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NEJ; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • DocketLocation: Pasadena Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NEJ; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2001
  • DocketLocation: Pasadena Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NEJ; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2001
  • DocketLocation: Pasadena Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NEJ; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2000
  • DocketLocation: Pasadena Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NEJ; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2000
  • DocketLocation: Pasadena Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NEJ; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/1998
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: CERTIFIED PLEA/SENTENCING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 12500(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/1998
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; JAIL TERM: 5 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/1998
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 180 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 14601.1(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/1998
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11377(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/1998
  • DocketCharge Section: 12500(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/1998
  • DocketCharge Section: 14601.1(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/1998
  • DocketCharge Section: 11377(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less