Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 19:59:50 (UTC).

HERD, VICTOR

Case Summary

On 03/09/1995 HERD, VICTOR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/1995

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Catalina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

HERD, VICTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/1997
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1997
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/1996
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/1996
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 04; JAIL TERM: 8 MONTH(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 03; JAIL TERM: 8 MONTH(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; JAIL TERM: 2 YEAR(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; JAIL TERM: 10 YEAR(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOK; Event: JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SOD; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 236; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 236; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less