This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 08:17:14 (UTC).

HARRIS, ERIC WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 07/20/1999 HARRIS, ERIC WILLIAM was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-03

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/1999

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

HARRIS, ERIC WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2005
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • DispositionCharge Section: 136.1(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • DispositionCharge Section: 136.1(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • DispositionCharge Section: 245(A)(2); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • DispositionCharge Section: 245(A)(2); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • DispositionCharge Section: 245(A)(2); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2002
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2002
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 069; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/1999
  • DocketCharge Section: 136.1(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/1999
  • DocketCharge Section: 136.1(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/1999
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(2); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/1999
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(2); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/1999
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(2); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less