This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2020 at 15:06:54 (UTC).

GARIBAY, FRANK

Case Summary

On 03/27/2000 GARIBAY, FRANK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********7-03

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2000

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

GARIBAY, FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2004
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: EXHIBIT DISPOSAL LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PACE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PACE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DispositionCharge Section: 243(D); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DispositionCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DispositionCharge Section: 4501; Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 03; JAIL TERM: 4 YEAR(S) IN ANY STATE PRISON; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: 1368 PC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PACE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: 1368 PC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWE; Event: 1368 PC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWP; Event: 1368 PC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWP; Event: 1368 PC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWP; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2000
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWP; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2000
  • DocketCharge Section: 243(D); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2000
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2000
  • DocketCharge Section: 4501; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less