Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 16:42:42 (UTC).

DELCID, JORGE ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 08/21/1996 DELCID, JORGE ALBERTO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

DELCID, JORGE ALBERTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: BAIL REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/1999
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 066; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 14601.1(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 48 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 48 HOUR(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $750.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 25 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: THE DEFENDANT SHALL ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE A 3-MONTH LICENSED FIRST-OFFENDER ALCOHOL AND OTHER DRUG EDUCATION AND COUNSELING PROGRAM.; LICENSE RESTRICTION/SUSPENSION: RESTRICT DRIVING FOR 26 DAY(S) TO AND FROM WORK, TO AND FROM PROGRAM, DURING WORK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 14601.1(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A)

    Read MoreRead Less