This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 00:32:01 (UTC).

CORDOVA, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 07/16/1996 CORDOVA, MICHAEL ANTHONY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse West located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

CORDOVA, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/1997
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/1997
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PROBATION SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 273.5(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 150 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/1996
  • DocketLocation: Van Nuys Courthouse West; Dept/Room Number: NWF; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 273.5(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less