Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 16:32:06 (UTC).

CAMARILLO, RAUL AGUAYO

Case Summary

On 08/12/1996 CAMARILLO, RAUL AGUAYO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

CAMARILLO, RAUL AGUAYO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/1998
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: SURRENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 060; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: PROOF OF COMPLETION/FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 065; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less