This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 22:46:16 (UTC).

BERUMEN, JOSE DEJESUS

Case Summary

On 01/19/1995 BERUMEN, JOSE DEJESUS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/1995

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

BERUMEN, JOSE DEJESUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: PROBATION VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: POST SENTENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOF; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/1999
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/1998
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: SOJ; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/1995
  • DispositionCharge Section: 653W(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/1995
  • DocketLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: SO6; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/1995
  • DocketCharge Section: 653W(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less