Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 16:39:27 (UTC).

AVILA, ESLI

Case Summary

On 08/16/1996 AVILA, ESLI was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/1996

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

AVILA, ESLI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF DOMESTIC VIOL CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: FINES/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: POSSIBLE VIOL. OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/1997
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF AA MEETING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PROOF OF CAL TRANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 422; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/1996
  • DispositionCharge Section: 273.5(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/1996
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); JAIL TERM: 45 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: BAIL REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/1996
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 061; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 422; Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/1996
  • DocketCharge Section: 273.5(A)

    Read MoreRead Less