This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 16:18:22 (UTC).

PRUGO, NICHOLAS FRANK

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 PRUGO, NICHOLAS FRANK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3-02

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

PRUGO, NICHOLAS FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: SUBSEQUENT ADR SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 042; Event: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DispositionCharge Section: 646.9(A); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed per 1203.4 P.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 042; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 042; Event: PROOF OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 042; Event: PROOF OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 042; Event: PROOF OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: FINES/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 042; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; PROGRAM: COMMUNITY SERVICE 350 HOUR(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: READINESS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: P50001205879; Surety Company: CONTINENTAL HERITAGE; Bond Agent: ACME B/B; Amount of Bail: 485000.00; Apperance Date: October 6, 2015; Bail Activity: October 6, 2015: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: November 19, 2015: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: November 19, 2015: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 12, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: March 23, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: April 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: June 8, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 8, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 18, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 28, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 3, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 3, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 3, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 29, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: September 12, 2016: Exonerated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCharge Section: 646.9(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCharge Section: 646.9(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCharge Section: 646.9(A); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCharge Section: 653F(C); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less