This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 22:50:15 (UTC).

DIEGO, ARIEL ALEJANDRO

Case Summary

On 01/07/2011 DIEGO, ARIEL ALEJANDRO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

DIEGO, ARIEL ALEJANDRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketLocation; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: SUBSEQUENT ADR SUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: MOTION TO VACATE PLEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23103; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DispositionCharge Section: 12500(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 04; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $390.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 3 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: THE DEFENDANT SHALL ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE A 3-MONTH LICENSED FIRST-OFFENDER ALCOHOL AND OTHER DRUG EDUCATION AND COUNSELING PROGRAM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: MOTION TO VACATE PLEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketLocation; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • DocketLocation; Dept/Room Number: C61; Event: PROOF OF MISCELLANEOUS ITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 36 MONTH(S); BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $390.00; (OR) Jail term instead of fine: 13 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; PROGRAM: CAL TRANS 11 DAY(S); PROGRAM INSTEAD OF FINE: JAIL OR FINE; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: THE DEFENDANT SHALL ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE A 3-MONTH LICENSED FIRST-OFFENDER ALCOHOL AND OTHER DRUG EDUCATION AND COUNSELING PROGRAM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 075; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 060; Event: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketLocation: Metropolitan Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 060; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCharge Section: 23103; Plea: Nolo Contendere

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCharge Section: 12500(A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less