Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 05:32:53 (UTC).

THOMPSON, MARSERVETTE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 THOMPSON, MARSERVETTE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********8-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

THOMPSON, MARSERVETTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: ; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DEMAND ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 29800(A)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 664-518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 594(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 664-518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: AS100K46123; Surety Company: ALLEGHENY CASUALTY; Bond Agent: ANSWER BAIL BONDS; Amount of Bail: ; Apperance Date: February 18, 2021; Bail Activity: February 18, 2021: Forfeiture

    Read MoreRead Less