Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 12:29:31 (UTC).

ROMERO, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 ROMERO, ROBERT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1-03

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROMERO, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingLocation: Torrance Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 004; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 594(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 487(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: AS30K139694; Surety Company: ALLEGHENY CASUALTY; Bond Agent: ANSWER BAIL BONDS; Amount of Bail: 20000.00; Apperance Date: March 23, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less