This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 12:38:10 (UTC).

PREJEAN, SHADDAI

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 PREJEAN, SHADDAI was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

PREJEAN, SHADDAI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/30/2022

HearingLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: 1368 PC RPT/NON-APPEAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: 1368 PC RPT/NON-APPEAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: 1368 PC RPT/NON-APPEAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2022

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: 1368 PC RPT/NON-APPEAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2021

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021

BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: LAB652819010; Surety Company; Bond Agent; Amount of Bail; Apperance Date: November 15, 2021; Bail Activity: November 19, 2021 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: December 16, 2021 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: February 3, 2022 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: March 23, 2022 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: April 22, 2022 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 13, 2022 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 1, 2022 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 19, 2022 Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: November 18, 2022 Bail To Stand

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketLocation: Glendale Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 001; Event: MENTAL COMPETENCY REFERRAL ORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less