This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 07:06:08 (UTC).

MURILLO, RAMON

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 MURILLO, RAMON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********7-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MURILLO, RAMON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: Bellflower Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 006; Event: DIVERSION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingLocation: Bellflower Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 006; Event: PROOF OF ENROLLMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketLocation: Bellflower Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 002; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11350; Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Pending Entry of Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: DIVERSION 12 MONTH(S); BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 11350; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less