Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 06:54:48 (UTC).

MUNGUIA, ABEL

Case Summary

On 02/04/2016 MUNGUIA, ABEL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********8-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Catalina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MUNGUIA, ABEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: BOND MOTION/NON-APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 651; Event: MOT TO VACATE BAIL/BOND FORFEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: BAIL/BOND MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 651; Event: MOT TO VACATE BAIL/BOND FORFEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: BAIL/BOND MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S22; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S22; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S22; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PRELIMINARY TRANSCRIPT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCharge Section: 211; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCharge Section: 245(A)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: 2016FF000228; Surety Company: LEXNGTON NAT INS COR; Bond Agent: YOUR WAY OUT B/B; Amount of Bail: 150000.00; Apperance Date: January 20, 2016; Bail Activity: February 8, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: February 18, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: March 16, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: April 12, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 9, 2016: Forfeiture; Bail Activity: May 25, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: June 9, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: June 9, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 13, 2016: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 10, 2016: Forfeiture; Bail Activity: February 22, 2017: Demand Notice Issued; Bail Activity: October 6, 2017: Summary Judgment Requested; Bail Activity: October 6, 2017: Summary Judgment Issued; Bail Activity: October 20, 2017: Bond Forfeiture Paid

    Read MoreRead Less