This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 06:21:42 (UTC).

MATSUMOTO, GEORGE

Case Summary

On 11/15/2016 MATSUMOTO, GEORGE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Catalina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

MATSUMOTO, GEORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S19; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: RESTITUTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; JAIL TERM: 19 YEAR(S) TO LIFE IMPRISONMENT; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DispositionCharge Section: 187(A); Plea: PLead Guilty; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: S20; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketLocation: Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PRELIMINARY TRANSCRIPT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketCharge Section: 187(A); Plea: PLead Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less