This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 05:34:34 (UTC).

LOPEZ, JACK

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 LOPEZ, JACK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

LOPEZ, JACK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 038; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 422(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 273.5(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 646.9(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 166(C)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 422(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 273.5(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 646.9(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: PC3001403748; Surety Company: CONTINENTAL HERITAGE; Bond Agent: ACME B/B; Amount of Bail: 20000.00; Apperance Date: February 27, 2020; Bail Activity: February 27, 2020: Exonerated

    Read MoreRead Less