This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 03:01:20 (UTC).

KILPATRICK, VANESSA

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 KILPATRICK, VANESSA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

KILPATRICK, VANESSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingLocation: Bellflower Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 005; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketLocation: Bellflower Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: 005; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 243(E)(1); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: SV255083873; Surety Company: SEAVIEW INS COMPANY; Bond Agent: ALADDIN BAIL BONDS; Amount of Bail: 20000.00; Apperance Date: September 24, 2020; Bail Activity: September 24, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: September 24, 2020: Bail To Stand

    Read MoreRead Less