This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2020 at 12:14:38 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, BLAS

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 GONZALEZ, BLAS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

GONZALEZ, BLAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • HearingLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PROGRESS REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PROGRESS REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PPRF RPT - APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DispositionCharge Section: 487(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 02; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 97 DAY(S) IN; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; PROGRAM: COMMUNITY LABOR 60 DAY(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: BND; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PROBATION AND SENTENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: BENCH WARRANT HOLD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: PRETRIAL CONF/TRIAL SETTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 114; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCharge Section: 487(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCharge Section: 487(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: FS1001844744; Surety Company: FINAN CAS & SUR INC; Bond Agent: BAIL HOTLINE B/B; Amount of Bail: 70000.00; Apperance Date: February 22, 2018; Bail Activity: April 19, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: June 19, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 6, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 6, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: September 18, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: October 16, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: October 22, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: December 10, 2018: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 10, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 10, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 16, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 22, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 22, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 22, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 22, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: January 22, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: April 2, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 8, 2019: Forfeiture; Bail Activity: May 24, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: May 24, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 5, 2019: Forfeiture; Bail Activity: August 16, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: August 16, 2019: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: September 26, 2019: Forfeiture; Bail Activity: December 11, 2019: Exonerated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less