This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 11:18:40 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, AMERICA

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 GONZALEZ, AMERICA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

GONZALEZ, AMERICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/21/2022

HearingLocation; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PROOF OF COMPLETION/FINE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

DocketLocation; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: PROOF OF ENROLLMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022

DocketLocation; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A04; Event: PRETRIAL HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

DispositionCharge Section: 23103; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

DispositionCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

DispositionCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2022

SentenceFor Count(s): 03; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: SUMMARY PROBATION 12 MONTH(S); BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $390.00; ALCOHOL PROGRAM: THE DEFENDANT SHALL ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE A 3-MONTH LICENSED FIRST-OFFENDER ALCOHOL AND OTHER DRUG EDUCATION AND COUNSELING PROGRAM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2021

DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A04; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketCharge Section: 23103; Plea: Nolo Contendere

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less