Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 05:27:20 (UTC).

GANDHI, ANSHUL MIHIR

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 GANDHI, ANSHUL MIHIR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

GANDHI, ANSHUL MIHIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 050; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: JUDICIAL ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: 030; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: FS1002134130; Surety Company: FINAN CAS & SUR INC; Bond Agent: ANTHONY ADORNETTO BB; Amount of Bail: ; Apperance Date: September 18, 2020; Bail Activity: June 29, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: June 29, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 1, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: July 8, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: September 18, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: December 1, 2020: Bail To Stand; Bail Activity: February 4, 2021: Bail To Stand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketLocation: Clara Shortridge Foltz Criminal Justice Center; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 243.4(D); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 243.4(D); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 243.4(D); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCharge Section: 243.4(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less