Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 05:08:49 (UTC).

COLLIER, LARRY JR

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 COLLIER, LARRY JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Fernando Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Fernando Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

COLLIER, LARRY JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: San Fernando Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NVG; Event: PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: San Fernando Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NVH; Event: PRELIM SETTING/RESETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketLocation: San Fernando Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: NVS; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 23247(E); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(B); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 23152(A); Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 2800.4; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCharge Section: 2800.2; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • BailRECEIPT/BOND NUMBER: T10050828381; Surety Company: THE NO RIVER INS COM; Bond Agent: BAD BOYS BAIL BONDS; Amount of Bail: ; Apperance Date: February 18, 2021; Bail Activity: February 18, 2021: Bail To Stand

    Read MoreRead Less