This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 06:36:55 (UTC).

BROXTON, RICHARD ANDRA

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 BROXTON, RICHARD ANDRA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********6-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

BROXTON, RICHARD ANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: SUBSEQUENT ADR SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: CLK; Event: DOCKET LINE ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A20; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A20; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A04; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A02; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A02; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A02; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A02; Event: SETTING OF VIOLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A01; Event: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A06; Event: BENCH WARRANT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A21; Event: RESTITUTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A21; Event: RESTITUTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A17; Event: EARLY DISPOSITION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DispositionCharge Section: 11350; Plea: Not Guilty; Disposition: Dismissed or Not Prosecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DispositionCharge Section: 594(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere; Disposition: Guilty/Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • SentenceFor Count(s): 01; PROBATION/MANDATORY SUPERVISION: FORMAL PROBATION 3 YEAR(S); JAIL TERM: 40 DAY(S) IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY JAIL; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00; BASE FINE/TOTAL FINE: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketLocation: Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse; Dept/Room Number: A01; Event: ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCharge Section: 11350; Plea: Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCharge Section: 594(A); Plea: Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.