This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 09:53:58 (UTC).

ZVI NARDI VS LOCAL CHAOS LLC DBA L & L HAWAIIAN BBQ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 ZVI NARDI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOCAL CHAOS LLC DBA L L HAWAIIAN BBQ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4208

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NARDI ZVI

Defendants

L & L FRANCHISE INC.

LOCAL CHAOS LLC DBA L & L HAWAIIAN BBQ

STORE MANAGER DOE 1

LEYEN FOOD LLC

GARDENA L&L INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

BROUSES BERNADETTE CASTILLO

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/28/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/8/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/15/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/26/2022: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2025
  • Hearing04/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gardena L&L, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Gardena L&L, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/31/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Gardena L&L, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Leyen Food, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Leyen Food, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: L & L Franchise, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/09/2022; Service Cost: 239.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Local Chaos LLC dba L & L Hawaiian BBQ (Defendant); L & L Franchise, Inc. (Defendant); DOE 1 (Store Manager) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Local Chaos LLC dba L & L Hawaiian BBQ (Defendant); L & L Franchise, Inc. (Defendant); DOE 1 (Store Manager) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zvi Nardi (Plaintiff); As to: Local Chaos LLC dba L & L Hawaiian BBQ (Defendant); L & L Franchise, Inc. (Defendant); DOE 1 (Store Manager) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less