This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 00:21:21 (UTC).

ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9449

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZURU LLC

Defendants

BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION

PFLUG PACKAGING & FULFILLMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIARDULLO JEAN-PAUL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

Notice of Related Case

9/9/2022: Notice of Related Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Attachment - ATTACHMENT LOCAL RULES REMINDER TO ATTORNEYS 3.42 AND 3.43

9/19/2022: Attachment - ATTACHMENT LOCAL RULES REMINDER TO ATTORNEYS 3.42 AND 3.43

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ZURU LLC (Plaintiff); As to: BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/13/2022; Service Cost: 187.72; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAttachment Local Rules Reminder to Attorneys 3.42 and 3.43; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ZURU LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PFLUG PACKAGING & FULFILLMENT, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/16/2022; Service Cost: 244.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jean-Paul Ciardullo, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jean-Paul Ciardullo, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- ZURU LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY to ZURU LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION (Defendant): Organization Name changed from BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION to BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); PFLUG PACKAGING & FULFILLMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); PFLUG PACKAGING & FULFILLMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); PFLUG PACKAGING & FULFILLMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: ZURU LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc. a Corportion is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY CITIES CONTAINER CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant