This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2022 at 04:48:03 (UTC).

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0776

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/21/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/18/2022; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO