This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 07:01:40 (UTC).

ZURI MESICA VS HALEY MARIE WEST

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 ZURI MESICA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HALEY MARIE WEST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0303

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MESICA ZURI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

WEST HAILEY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PANAH D. HESS

ARIAS MICKEL MONTALBAN

YAZDANPANAH HESAM DEAN ESQ.

ARIAS MICKEL MONTALBAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HAKOPIAN JOSEPH J.

HAKOPIAN JOSEPH J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/3/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND ALL RELATED DISCOVERY DATES

1/14/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND ALL RELATED DISCOVERY DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC, AND ALL RELATED DISC...) OF 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC, AND ALL RELATED DISC...) OF 01/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC, AND ALL RELATED DISC...)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC, AND ALL RELATED DISC...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/5/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

9/5/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/5/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Mail

8/9/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Civil Case Cover Sheet - /Addendum

4/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - /Addendum

Summons -

4/3/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

4/3/2018: Complaint -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Hearing07/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Hearing06/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Zuri Mesica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (FSC, and All Related Discovery Dates, Filed by the Defendant) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial FSC, and All Related Disc...) of 01/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial FSC, and All Related Disc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Hailey Marie West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hailey Marie West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Hailey Marie West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Zuri Mesica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by Hesam Dean Yazdanpanah, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Zuri Mesica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zuri Mesica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700303    Hearing Date: January 28, 2020    Dept: 29

Mesica v. West

Motion to Continue Trial, FSC and all Related Discovery Dates is GRANTED.

The trial is set for 7/16/2020 at 8:30 a.m. The final status conference is set for June 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. All discovery and motion cut off dates are calculated by reference to the new trial date.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the parties. The Court presumes that the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.