Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2021 at 04:03:47 (UTC).

ZULEIMA JIMENEZ VS OSCAR LEYVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 ZULEIMA JIMENEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OSCAR LEYVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6072

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

JIMENEZ ZULEIMA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LEYVA OSCAR

LEYVA AN INDIVIDUAL MINERVA

LEYVA MINERVA

BERNAL RAMON

THE ESTATE OF OSCAR LEYVA DECEDANT

BERNAL ERASMO

JIMENEZ JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KIRAN MARK RAMOS

LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

DAVIS BREYON J

Defendant Attorneys

ONYENACHO BEN A

ONYENACHO BENEDICT AGUNNIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT A...)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT A...)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/8/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Substitution of Attorney

7/8/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

11/29/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/18/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO OSC

11/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

7/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

5/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

5/14/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

5/14/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Hearing07/29/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default as to the cross-defendants) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default a...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Minerva Leyva, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Minerva Leyva, an individual (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Minerva Leyva, an individual (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Minerva Leyva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Estate of Oscar Leyva, decedant (Defendant); Minerva Leyva, an individual (Defendant); Minerva Leyva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Zuleima Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)); Filed by Zuleima Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint (FOR DAMAGES AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF); Filed by Zuleima Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zuleima Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS BREYON JAHMAI