This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 03:30:04 (UTC).

ZOLEE LEWIS VS. QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 ZOLEE LEWIS filed an Other lawsuit against QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8773

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS ZOLEE

Defendants

DOES 1-250

FH & HF TORRANCE I LLC

FAMILY HEALTH & HOUSING FOUNDATION

QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN M.

Defendant Attorney

CLARK HILL LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Case dismissed/disposed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (OSC RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B)) - Case dismissed/disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ZOLEE LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (UNCONDITIONAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNtc of Change of Firm Name & Addr (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY THE FIRM GARCIA, ARTIGLIERE, MEDBY & FAULKNER SHALL NOW BE KNOWN AS GARCIA, ARTIGLIERE & MEDBY. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by ZOLEE LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by ZOLEE LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketMotion; Filed by ZOLEE LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketMotion (FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CCP 36; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ZOLEE LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL