This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 15:30:39 (UTC).

ZOILA LEON SANTIAGO VS ALYSSA AGUILAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 ZOILA LEON SANTIAGO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALYSSA AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8648

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTIAGO ZOILA LEON

Defendants

AGUILAR LEONARDO

AGUILAR ALYSSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNING NATHAN A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Redemption/Remittance Notice

6/5/2019: Redemption/Remittance Notice

Certificate of Mailing for

6/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Summons

5/29/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees

5/29/2019: Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees

Complaint

5/29/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Zoila Leon Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Zoila Leon Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • PI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Zoila Leon Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zoila Leon Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by Zoila Leon Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees; Filed by Zoila Leon Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANNING NATHAN A