Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 07:23:22 (UTC).

ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0801

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ZIRKLE GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MIKE LEV AN INDIVIDUAL

DEREK ZIRKLE AN INDIVIDUAL

MESEONZNIK ALEX

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

SSRE HOLDINGS LLC DBA SIGNATURE FRESH A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RINDT TOM

WETCH STANLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

HORWITZ MARTIN L

Defendant Attorney

WADE STEPHEN R.

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE;)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/12/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

3/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY BY DEFENDANT SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC

1/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY BY DEFENDANT SSRE HOLDINGS, LLC

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

1/5/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/12/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Dismissal

12/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/16/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE DETERMINATION;)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE DETERMINATION;) OF 12/07/2020

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE DETERMINATION;) OF 12/07/2020

Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SSRE Holdings, LLC, (Defendant); STANLEY WETCH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SSRE Holdings, LLC, (Defendant); STANLEY WETCH (Defendant); TOM RINDT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling at Trial Setting Conference); Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Case Determination;) of 12/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ZIRKLE GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADE STEPHEN R.