Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 16:27:42 (UTC).

ZIREN COELHO VS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 ZIREN COELHO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2694

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COELHO ZIREN

Defendants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC. DBA CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS CCI INC.

SPRAGUE MARCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL NIRAL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • Hearing08/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ziren Coelho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ziren Coelho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATEL NIRAL RAJNIKANT