This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 17:24:17 (UTC).

ZIONS BANCORPORATION, N.A. VS ALEKSANDR M. FELTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 ZIONS BANCORPORATION, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALEKSANDR M FELTON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1752

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST

Defendants

FELTON ALEKSANDR M.

HIGH PEAKS LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TRUSTEE OF THE 6 COLT LANE TRUST

IAKYM OLGA AKA OLGA FELTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH BARRY A.

Defendant Attorney

TRENK JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING

1/10/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING

Case Management Statement

1/4/2023: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING

11/8/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/5/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/9/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/16/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF SAME

6/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF SAME

Case Management Statement

6/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING; Signed and Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ALEKSANDR M. FELTON (Defendant); OLGA IAKYM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Demurrer Hearing; Signed and Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ALEKSANDR M. FELTON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: HIGH PEAKS LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, TRUSTEE OF THE 6 COLT LANE TRUST (Defendant); Service Date: 01/17/2022; Service Cost: 258.60; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department U - Hon. Valerie Salkineffective 01/10/2022; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ALEKSANDR M. FELTON (Defendant); OLGA IAKYM (Defendant); HIGH PEAKS LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, TRUSTEE OF THE 6 COLT LANE TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ALEKSANDR M. FELTON (Defendant); OLGA IAKYM (Defendant); HIGH PEAKS LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, TRUSTEE OF THE 6 COLT LANE TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ALEKSANDR M. FELTON (Defendant); OLGA IAKYM (Defendant); HIGH PEAKS LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, TRUSTEE OF THE 6 COLT LANE TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bernie C. LaForteza in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST FKA ZB N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH BARRY A. ESQ.