This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 04:16:21 (UTC).

ZINA YOUNESSI VS NAZI ZENDEDEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 ZINA YOUNESSI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NAZI ZENDEDEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4514

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YOUNESSI ZINA

Defendants and Respondents

ZENDEDEL NAZI

ZENDEDEL BAHRAM

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BISLA KIRAN K. ESQ.

BISLA KIRAN KAUR ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MASSERMAN TERRI L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Separate Statement

9/5/2019: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

9/5/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/16/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/15/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

11/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION SEPARATE STATEMENT REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE

11/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION SEPARATE STATEMENT REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

12/11/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

12/11/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET ONE

12/11/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET ONE

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. BOROWSKI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FOUR MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

12/13/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. BOROWSKI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FOUR MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES --525...)

12/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES --525...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

Notice of Ruling

1/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT) OF 01/22/2020

1/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT) OF 01/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT)

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT)

ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS FOR DAMAGES

6/8/2018: ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

2/21/2018: SUMMONS

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Zina Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 11:53 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Conditional Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Conditional Settlement) of 01/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Zina Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Nazi Zendedel (Defendant); Bahram Zendedel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue the Trial Date and FSC Date) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Nazi Zendedel (Defendant); Bahram Zendedel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Zina Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nazi Zendedel (Defendant); Bahram Zendedel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Zina Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zina Younessi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694514    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ZINA YOUNESSI,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NAZI ZENDEDEL, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC694514

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Dept. 3

10:00 a.m.

December 18, 2019

Defendants served responses to Plaintiff’s discovery on 7/17/19. Plaintiff filed motions to compel on 9/05/19, but did not serve the motions on Defendants until 10/03/19. The motions to compel are summarily denied. CCP §2030.300(c) requires the moving party to give “notice” of the motions to compel within 45 days after receipt of responses. Delaying the motion beyond the 45-day time limit waives the right to compel a further response to the discovery. CCP § 2030.300(c); see Vidal Sassoon, Inc. v. Superior Court (1983) 147 Cal.App.3d 681, 685. Plaintiff cites no authority for the position that the motions can be timely filed but not timely served and survive a §2030.300(c) attack, and the Court knows of no such authority. The code itself requires “notice” of the motions, and filing the motions with the Court does not give the other side “notice” of the motions.

The Court finds both attorneys contributed to the failure to resolve the issues relating to these discovery motions, and declines to impose any sanctions.

The Court notes that both parties submitted courtesy copies of their extremely voluminous papers relating to this motion. The parties failed, however, to tab the courtesy copies, as required by CRC 3.1110(d). Courtesy copies without tabs do not meaningfully assist the Court in reviewing voluminous papers. The Court asks Counsel, in the future in connection with this and other actions, to ensure all courtesy copies are properly tabbed in compliance with the Rules of Court.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC694514    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ZINA YOUNESSI,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NAZI ZENDEDEL, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC694514

ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 12, 2019

This case has motions to compel on calendar on 12/12/19, and also has motions to compel on calendar 12/18/19. The Court wishes to hear all of the motions together. The 12/12/19 hearings are therefore continued to 12/18/19 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 3, to be heard contemporaneously with the scheduled 12/18/19 motions. Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.