This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 03:37:05 (UTC).

ZINA JALAJEL VS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ZINA JALAJEL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4878

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JALAJEL ZINA

Defendants

DOE JOHN

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'EGIDIO ARTHUR PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/1/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

11/1/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

11/1/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2024
  • Hearing10/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2024
  • Hearing04/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2024
  • Hearing04/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zina Jalajel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zina Jalajel (Plaintiff); As to: U-Haul Co. of California (Defendant); John Doe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zina Jalajel (Plaintiff); As to: U-Haul Co. of California (Defendant); John Doe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'Egidio, Arthur P