Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 18:00:26 (UTC).

ZINA BUNDUCHI, AN INDIVIDUAL VS WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 ZINA BUNDUCHI, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2983

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUNDUCHI AN INDIVIDUAL ZINA

BUNDUCHI ZINA

Defendants

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

DOES 1-50

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYAB DAVID

Defendant Attorney

HAMILTON MELANIE M.

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/15/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

12/15/2020: Notice of Related Case

Request for Dismissal

12/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/19/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Ruling

10/26/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/23/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Zina Bunduchi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by West Hills Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by West Hills Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants West Hills Hospital and West Hills Hospital & Medical Center) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Zina Bunduchi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zina Bunduchi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zina Bunduchi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zina Bunduchi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST HILLS HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST HILLS HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYAB DAVID