This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:55:37 (UTC).

ZHIJUN LI VS AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 ZHIJUN LI filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3153

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LI ZHIJUN

ZHIJUN LI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

TAG-2 MEDICAL INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FLIGSTEN DAN

FLIGSTEN DANIEL BARTLETT

WATKINS ASHTON RYAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BLESSEY RAYMOND LESLIE ESQ

BLESSEY RAYMOND LESLIE

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

REBACK MCANDREWS & BLESSEY LLP

NOWOTNY GEORGE EDWARD III

NOWOTNY GEORGE E. ESQ.

BLESSEY RAYMOND L. ESQ

HUGHES TRACY D

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

5/8/2018: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/18/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

Legacy Document

7/13/2018: Legacy Document

Demand for Jury Trial

7/18/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Legacy Document

7/26/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

7/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice

9/13/2018: Notice

Legacy Document

9/14/2018: Legacy Document

Notice

9/14/2018: Notice

Case Management Statement

10/24/2018: Case Management Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/9/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Certificate of Mailing for

11/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Case Management Statement

3/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/11/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

SUMMONS

4/23/2018: SUMMONS

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by TAG-2 MEDICAL INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of this Case in Its Entirety and/or the Imposition of Sanctions, Payable by Plaintiff's Counsel, in the Amount of $2,500, for Failure to Appear at the Court's Status Conference and Failure to File a Case Management Statement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of this Case in Its Entiret...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Declaration (of Ashton Watkins RE: May 14, 2019 Status Conference); Filed by Zhijun Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Zhijun Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference) of 05/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice (of motion for order substituting personal representative for deceased plaintiff); Filed by Zhijun Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Answer; Filed by TAG-2 MEDICAL INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Zhijun Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Zhijun Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703153    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: E

MOTION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

Case: Zhijun Li v. AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, et al. (BC 703153)

TENTATIVE RULING:

This matter was continued from 10/18/19 for the purposes of permitting plaintiff to address various deficiencies in the Amended Motion for Order Substituting Successors in Interest for Deceased Plaintiff, which the Court identified in explicit detail in its tentative ruling issued on 10/18/19. Plaintiff has made no supplemental of showing since 10/18/19. Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED for the reason set forth in the Court’s 10/18/19 Minute Order.

The Court hereby issues an Order to Show Cause Why this Matter Should Not Be Dismissed Due to Plaintiff’s Death and/or Failure to Prosecute. The hearing on such Order to Show Cause is set for 4/20/20, which is two years from the date of initial filing of this action.