Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2019 at 22:27:46 (UTC).

ZHENGYUN BI VS NIANFEI BU ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 ZHENGYUN BI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NIANFEI BU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4112

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BI ZHENGYUN

Defendants and Respondents

ZHANG JOANNA

JASMIN GARDEN INC

JABU INTERNATIONAL INC

MU SELINA

ZHANG HOURONG

BU NIANFEI

DOES 1 TO 50

MU XIYAN

HOURONG ZHANG

LIU [DOE 1] GUANGYU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

QI STEVE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KEVIN LIU

DAVIS MICHAEL D. ESQ.

NIZINSKI LOREN LAW OFFICES OF

LIU KEVIN

 

Court Documents

GENERAL DENIAL

2/22/2018: GENERAL DENIAL

AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

6/18/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/28/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order

5/28/2019: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

3/27/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

3/28/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service

4/13/2017: Proof of Service

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/2/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/9/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE (CIVIL)

8/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE (CIVIL)

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

8/21/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/28/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT XIYAN MU AKA SELINA MU'S SPECIAL AND GENERAL DEMURRES TO PLAINTIFF?S PIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/13/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT XIYAN MU AKA SELINA MU'S SPECIAL AND GENERAL DEMURRES TO PLAINTIFF?S PIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD 2. CONVERSION 3. INDEMNIFICATION 4. CONTRIBUTION

9/22/2017: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD 2. CONVERSION 3. INDEMNIFICATION 4. CONTRIBUTION

RULING RE: DEFENDANT XIYAN MU'S DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

9/25/2017: RULING RE: DEFENDANT XIYAN MU'S DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 2:05 PM in Department 61; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Zhengyun Bi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zhengyun Bi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES FOR: 1. FRAUD ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC654112    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to the Law Offices of Steve Qi & Associates, counsel for Plaintiff Zhengyun Bi. The motion complies with the above requirements.

Law Offices of Steve Qi & Associates’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff Zhengyun Bi is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JABU INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JASMIN GARDEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QI STEVE QI