This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:46:06 (UTC).

ZHENG TING LI, VS. SUIXI ZHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 ZHENG TING LI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUIXI ZHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6411

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LI ZHENG TING

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ZHANG SUIXI AN INDIVIDUAL

ZHANG SUIXI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RONALD E. DARLING ESQ.

DARLING RONALD EVERETT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PAUL P. CHENG

CHENG PAUL PO REN

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

3/14/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/18/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

7/6/2017: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/8/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

8/31/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

8/31/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

10/18/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

10/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

10/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/9/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Separate Statement

12/18/2017: Separate Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

12/28/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

12/28/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

1/4/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

1/4/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Motion to Enforce Settlement

4/8/2020: Motion to Enforce Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/30/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reProposed Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Judgement); Filed by ZHENG TING LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketReply (Reply RE No Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement); Filed by ZHENG TING LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DAVID T. CHING, ESQ. TO ALERT THE COURT SUIXI ZHANG IS NO LONGER REPRESENTED BY THE LAW OFFICES OF PAUL CHENG AND ASSOCIATES); Filed by SUIXI ZHANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ZHENG TING LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Sherilyn Learned O'Dell); Filed by ZHENG TING LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ZHENG TING LI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketNotice (of osc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO RELEASE OF DOCUMENTS ); Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC066411    Hearing Date: August 07, 2020    Dept: E

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

[CCP §664.6]

Date: 8/7/20 (8:30 AM)

Case: Zheng Ting Li v. Suixi Zhang (EC066411)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff/cross-defendant Zheng Ting Li’s UNOPPOSED Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement is CONTINUED to August 28, 2020, at 8:30 AM in Department E.

On July 9, 2018, pursuant to the parties’ written settlement, the Court dismissed the entire action and retained jurisdiction pursuant to CCP § 664.6.

On April 18, 2018, plaintiff/cross-defendant Zheng Ting Li and defendant/cross-complainant Suixi Zhang entered into a settlement agreement. (O’Dell Decl. ¶ 2 & Ex. A.) Defendant Zhang agreed to pay plaintiff Li $180,000, comprised of an initial payment of $40,000 and 24 monthly installments of $5,833 totaling $140,000, to resolve the claims in the action. (Id.) Defendant’s counsel was to prepare a stipulated judgment in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $359,000, sign the judgment, and provide it to plaintiff’s counsel. (Id.) If Zhang failed to make timely payments, plaintiff had the right seek the entry of the stipulated judgment. (Id.) Defendant’s counsel never provided the stipulated judgment. (O’Dell Decl. ¶ 3.)

Plaintiff Li only received $139,161 of the $180,000 owed under the settlement. (Li Decl. ¶¶ 2, 3 & Ex. E.) Accordingly, plaintiff is entitled to judgment in the amount of $219,839, or the difference between the stipulated judgment amount of $359,000 and the $139,161 already paid.

However, the motion was not served on defendant’s counsel of record. Plaintiff presents an email from the office of defendant’s counsel of record, the Law Offices of Paul P. Chang, indicating the email address of the attorney to whom correspondence regarding this action should purportedly be sent. (Yabko Decl. ¶ 2 & Ex. C.) Nonetheless, because the records in this action reflect defendant is represented by the Law Offices of Paul P. Chang, the Law Offices of Paul P. Chang must be served with this motion. (CCP §1015 [“[I]n all cases where a party has an attorney in the action or proceeding, the service of papers, when required, must be upon the attorney instead of the party . . . .”].) To be relieved of any responsibility for this action, defendant’s counsel of record must either cause a substitution of attorney form to be filed, pursuant to CCP § 284(1), or seek to be relieved as counsel, pursuant to CCP § 284(2), after which defendant may proceed in propria persona or substitute other counsel into this action.

Plaintiff shall provide notice of this ruling to defendant’s counsel of record.