This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 20:11:22 (UTC).

ZHAO DUAN VS HAVEN HOUSE RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 ZHAO DUAN filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against HAVEN HOUSE RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0309

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUAN ZHAO

Defendants

JOHNSON LINDON

HAVEN HOUSE RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG RANDY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)

Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 8-24-21)

8/24/2021: Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 8-24-21)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO QUASH

8/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION TO QUASH

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

6/8/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/9/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

6/9/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HAVEN HOUSE RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES, INC)

5/19/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HAVEN HOUSE RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES, INC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (LINDON JOHNSON)

5/19/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (LINDON JOHNSON)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

5/19/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

5/18/2021: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCourt Order/Ruling (Hearing 8-24-21); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOpposition (motion to quash); Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Haven House Residential Facilities, Inc)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Lindon Johnson)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Zhao Duan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 21NWCV00309 Hearing Date: August 24, 2021 Dept: C

DUAN v. HAVEN HOUSE RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES\r\nINC., et al.

\r\n\r\n

CASE NO.: 21NWCV00309

\r\n\r\n

HEARING: 8/24/21 @ 2:30 PM

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

#4

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE ORDER

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Specially Appearing Defendant Haven\r\nHouse Residential Facilities Inc.’s motion to quash service of summons is DENIED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Opposing Party to give NOTICE.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Specially\r\nAppearing Defendant Haven House Residential Facilities, Inc. (“Haven House”) moves\r\nto quash service of summons for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to CCP § 415.20.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

California\r\ncase law has held that a corporation cannot represent itself in court, either\r\nin propria persona or through an officer or agent who is not an attorney. (Merco Constr. Engineers, Inc. v. Municipal\r\nCourt (1978) 21 Cal. 3d 724, 729; Van Gundy v. Camelot Resorts, Inc.\r\n(1983) 152 Cal.App.3d Supp. 29, 32; Caressa Camille, Inc. v. Alcoholic Beverage\r\nControl Appeals Bd. (2002) 99 Cal.App.4th 1094, 1101.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The\r\nmotion is filed by Haven House Residential Facilities Inc. in pro per. Haven House cannot represent itself in\r\ncourt. Accordingly, the motion is\r\nDENIED.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY