This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:26:57 (UTC).

ZHANG, FUYUAN VS YANG, YANDONG

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 ZHANG, FUYUAN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against YANG, YANDONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HORAN, JAMES E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2171

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HORAN, JAMES E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZHANG FUYUAN

Respondent

YANG YANDONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SEROPIAN EDISSON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/18/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/12/2022: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

1/12/2022: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Proof of Service - CH-200 proof of service on YANG

1/6/2022: Proof of Service - CH-200 proof of service on YANG

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

12/22/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

12/22/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

12/22/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 201, Horan, James E., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 201, Horan, James E., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-200 proof of service on YANG ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Eddison