Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2021 at 02:17:38 (UTC).

ZHANET PETROSYAN VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 ZHANET PETROSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9241

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PETROSYAN ZHANET

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 20

REPPE ERIK KRISTIAN

Cross Defendants

REPPE ERIK KRISTIAN ROE 1

ROES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW BARM

BARM LAW

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARM LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

LAW BARM

OGUNNUBI MELISSA ANN

FEUER MICHAEL NELSON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL NELSON

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

9/25/2018: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

12/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/13/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/26/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2/10/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/10/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial

3/25/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/25/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/25/2018: ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice - Notice Of Intra Office Transfer Of Attorney Of Record

12/4/2018: Notice - Notice Of Intra Office Transfer Of Attorney Of Record

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/26/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICEOF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/23/2018: NOTICEOF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

8/23/2018: SUMMONS -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Zhanet Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Erik Kristian Reppe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Erik Kristian Reppe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Zhanet Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICEOF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zhanet Petrosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less