This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2022 at 11:45:54 (UTC).

ZHALEH JAVANFARD VS JRD UNICO INC.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 ZHALEH JAVANFARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JRD UNICO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3348

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAVANFARD ZHALEH

Defendant

JRD UNICO INC. AKA JETRO CASHAND CARRY ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

Defendant Attorney

BUBION JUSTIN A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/20/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/14/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2024
  • Hearing07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JRD Unico Inc. (Defendant); As to: Zhaleh Javanfard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Zhaleh Javanfard (Plaintiff); As to: JRD Unico Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/01/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Zhaleh Javanfard (Plaintiff); As to: JRD Unico Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Zhaleh Javanfard (Plaintiff); As to: JRD Unico Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zhaleh Javanfard (Plaintiff); As to: JRD Unico Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JRD UNICO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUBION JUSTIN