This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 03:32:21 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS DEMARLO SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DEMARLO SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6668

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SMITH DEMARLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS JEFFREY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF ACTION - JONATHAN GONZALEZ

11/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ACTION - JONATHAN GONZALEZ

Notice - NOTICE OF ACTION - TUAN PHAM

11/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ACTION - TUAN PHAM

PI General Order

11/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2024
  • Hearing10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Action - Jonathan Gonzalez; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Action - Tuan Pham; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant